This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2022 at 21:28:23 (UTC).

LIDOUSH MIRKHANI VS GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP., A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 LIDOUSH MIRKHANI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES, LP , A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8673

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRKHANI LIDOUSH

Defendants

THE MILLARD GROUP INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

MILLARD MALL SERVICES INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT CA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES RETAIL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINEVICH GARY ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

YU-CHIH ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/16/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

4/22/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2024
  • Hearing02/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Hearing09/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • Hearing08/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Glendale I Mall Associates, LP., a Delaware limited partnership (Defendant); The Millard Group, Inc., an Illinois corporation (Defendant); Millard Mall Services, Inc., an Illinois corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lidoush Mirkhani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lidoush Mirkhani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lidoush Mirkhani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENDALE I MALL ASSOCIATES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AKA GLENDALE GALLERIA is a litigant

Latest cases where THE MILLARD GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MILLARD MALL SERVICES INC. is a litigant