Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 20:40:56 (UTC).

LIDIA TANOUCHEVA VS CITY OF LONG BEACH

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 LIDIA TANOUCHEVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LONG BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9348

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TANOUCHEVA LIDIA

Defendants

CITY OF LONG BEACH

AZTECA LANDSCAPE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRHOELMAN GRANTH JERRET

Defendant Attorneys

BEVAN KYLE R.

ALLEN KEITH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/26/2021: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/16/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/25/2020: Answer

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Azteca Landscape, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Azteca Landscape, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lidia Tanoucheva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lidia Tanoucheva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Lidia Tanoucheva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Long Beach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lidia Tanoucheva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lidia Tanoucheva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lidia Tanoucheva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lidia Tanoucheva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases where AZTECA LANDSCAPE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEVAN KYLE R.