This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:56:47 (UTC).

LIDIA MKHITARIAN VS DOROTHY ANN JACKSON

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by LIDIA MKHITARIAN against DOROTHY ANN JACKSON in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3449

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MKHITARIAN LIDIA

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

JACKSON DOROTHY ANN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

8/8/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/9/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/23/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

4/23/2018: Summons

Complaint

4/23/2018: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Dorothy Ann Jackson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Dorothy Ann Jackson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lidia Mkhitarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet /Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Lidia Mkhitarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Lidia Mkhitarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC703449    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND MONETARY SANCTIONS

On April 23, 2018, Plaintiff Lidia Mkhitarian (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendant Dorothy Ann Jackson (“Defendant”) for negligence arising from an automobile accident. On July 30, 2019, Defendant served Supplemental Interrogatories (Set One) and Supplemental Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents (Set One) on Plaintiff. After the deadline to provide responses passed, defense counsel reminded Plaintiff to provide responses and documents. Defendant did not receive responses or documents. Defendant moves to compel.

Where a party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may make an order compelling responses. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300; Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 403.) A party that fails to serve timely responses waives any objections to the request, including ones based on privilege or the protection of attorney work product. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, subd. (a), 2031.300, subd. (a).) Unlike a motion to compel further responses, a motion to compel responses is not subject to a 45-day time limit and the propounding party has no meet and confer obligations. (Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc., supra, 148 Cal.App.4th at p. 404.)

Plaintiff filed no opposition to these Motions and did not serve responses to Defendant’s requests for discovery. Accordingly, the Motions to compel Plaintiff’s responses are GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objection, to Defendant’s Supplemental Special Interrogatories (Set One) and Supplemental Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents (Set On) within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.

Where the court grants a motion to compel responses, sanctions shall be imposed against the party who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel, unless the party acted with substantial justification or the sanction would otherwise be unjust. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (c), 2031.300, subd. (c).) Defendant’s request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED and imposed against Plaintiff and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the amount of $407.50 for two hours at defense counsel’s hourly rate of $143.75 and $120.00 in filing fees, to be paid within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative. The Court will be dark on November 18, 2019. A party requesting argument should contact Department 4B to obtain an alternate hearing date.