This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 21:11:52 (UTC).

LIBERTY PROPERTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A PENNSYLVANIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 LIBERTY PROPERTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A PENNSYLVANIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0249

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIBERTY PROPERTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A PENNSYLVANIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DGA SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

VIRGIN SCENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DGA SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA JIT TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLEMING SHELDON J.

Defendant Attorney

COHEN DAVID MARC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Application for Order to Post

11/1/2021: Application for Order to Post

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/4/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Amended Complaint

11/9/2021: Amended Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Continuance

11/15/2021: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

11/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Answer

11/17/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

RETURNED MAIL

9/30/2021: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

9/30/2021: RETURNED MAIL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING OF STATUS CONFERENCE DUE TO UNAVA...) OF 10/05/2021

10/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING OF STATUS CONFERENCE DUE TO UNAVA...) OF 10/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING OF STATUS CONFERENCE DUE TO UNAVA...)

10/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING OF STATUS CONFERENCE DUE TO UNAVA...)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • Hearing12/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Hearing12/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE); Filed by LIBERTY PROPERTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC., a California corporation (Defendant); VIRGIN SCENT INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by LIBERTY PROPERTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Amended Complaint); Filed by LIBERTY PROPERTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((VIRGIN SCENT INC., a California corporation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((DGA SERVICES, INC., a California corporation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC., a California corporation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LIBERTY PROPERTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LIBERTY PROPERTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LIBERTY PROPERTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by LIBERTY PROPERTY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, a Pennsylvania limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Propery Limited Partnership is a litigant

Latest cases where DAY TO DAY IMPORTS INC.; is a litigant

Latest cases where VIRGIN SCENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLEMING SHELDON J