This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 03:51:49 (UTC).

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL. VS CARMELA YOMTOUBIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2020 LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARMELA YOMTOUBIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0633

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

JOSEPH CRAIG

GORDON SYLVIA

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

YOMTOUBIAN CARMELA

JOHN S. ROY HEATING AND COOLING INC.

HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

JANKOWSKI-DUBIN EVELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEUSSEYAN NATALIE MARY

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ASH PAUL V.

LAKE DAVID NATHAN

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HIGGINS BARBARA ANN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

6/9/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

5/3/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling

4/28/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

10/13/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

10/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

10/7/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

8/10/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

6/26/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/28/2020: Complaint

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • Hearing10/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Carmela Yomtoubian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Carmela Yomtoubian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sylvia Gordon (Plaintiff); Craig Joseph (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Sylvia Gordon (Plaintiff); Craig Joseph (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Carmela Yomtoubian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Carmela Yomtoubian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by John S. Roy Heating and Cooling, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Safeco Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Safeco Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Sylvia Gordon (Plaintiff); Craig Joseph (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Sylvia Gordon (Plaintiff); Craig Joseph (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Sylvia Gordon (Plaintiff); Craig Joseph (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20SMCV00633    Hearing Date: April 27, 2021    Dept: P

Tentative Ruling

Liberty Mutual et al. v. Yomtoubian et al., Case No. 20SMCV00633

Hearing Date April 27, 2021

Defendant’s Notice of Related Cases

In this subrogation action, case No. 20SMCV00633, plaintiffs Liberty Mutual and Safeco allege work performed by defendant Roy in a condominium unit owned by defendant Yomtoubian caused a leak into their insureds’ condominiums. In case no. 20STCV38424, plaintiff Jankowski-Dubin, another condominium owner, sues Yomtoubian and Roy for damages to her unit arising out of the same leak. Defendants filed a notice of related cases, opposed by Jankowski-Dubin.

For cases to be deemed related, they must “involve the same parties and be based on the same or similar claims,” or involve “substantially identical question of law or fact.” Cal. Rule of Court 3.300. Jankowski-Dubin argues her lawsuit has a different plaintiff, does not involve an insurance claim, and is based on damage to a different condominium. She argues she will be prejudiced if the matters are deemed related because she has not been able to participate in discovery in 20SMCV00633 and would be forced to respond to discovery from various parties if the matters were consolidated following relation. The Rule of Court is disjunctive, listing four criteria for relating the cases if any one of the criteria is met. Cases involving “substantially identical questions of law or fact” are related even if they do not involve “the same parties.”

Both actions share identical defendants and arise out of the same leak. If the actions are tried separately, there is a risk of inconsistent outcomes. The cases arise out of “events requiring the determination of the same or substantially similar questions of law or fact,” and “are likely for other reasons to require substantial duplication of judicial resources if heard by different judges.” Cal. Rule of Court 3.300 (a)(2) and (4). The cases are related. GRANTED. DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC PARTIES AND COUNSEL ARE ENCOURAGED TO APPEAR BY LA COURT CONNECT.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERSHEL CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant