This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 12:57:32 (UTC).

LIAISON WEST DISTRIBUTION, INC. VS GG FOOD USA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 LIAISON WEST DISTRIBUTION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GG FOOD USA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0399

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIAISON WEST DISTRIBUTION INC.

Defendants

GG FOOD USA INC.

GANDOLFO GIOVANNI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMSAUR BRETT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/27/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/28/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Liaison West Distribution, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Liaison West Distribution, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Liaison West Distribution, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Liaison West Distribution, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Liaison West Distribution, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramsaur, Brett H