This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2021 at 17:58:39 (UTC).

LI, ZHENHUA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 LI, ZHENHUA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4137

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TIAN LI

Decedent

LI ZHENHUA

Not Classified By Court

FINCH MARY ARLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHIU KEVIN KIN

 

Court Documents

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

6/3/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Letters (Initial)

6/17/2021: Letters (Initial)

Bond - merchants bonding

6/17/2021: Bond - merchants bonding

Minute Order

5/28/2021: Minute Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

5/28/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140)

5/28/2021: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140)

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

5/10/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

4/30/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

4/28/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketBond (merchants bonding ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIU KEVIN KIN