Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2020 at 16:47:56 (UTC).

LI ZHANG, ET AL. VS KOKICHI NAKAZAWA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 LI ZHANG filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KOKICHI NAKAZAWA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6384

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZHANG LI

SHUWEI MENG

Defendants

NAKAZAWA SUMIE

NAKAZAWA KOKICHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCNICHOLAS PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

OKAZAKI BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/1/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/17/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Related Case

5/4/2020: Notice of Related Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Li Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Li Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kokichi Nakazawa (Defendant); Sumie Nakazawa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kokichi Nakazawa (Defendant); Sumie Nakazawa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Li Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Li Zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Li Zhang (Plaintiff); Meng Shuwei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Li Zhang (Plaintiff); Meng Shuwei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Li Zhang (Plaintiff); Meng Shuwei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Li Zhang (Plaintiff); Meng Shuwei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNICHOLAS JOHN PATRICK IV