This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2022 at 06:55:54 (UTC).

LI, JOHN R. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 LI, JOHN R - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1683

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LI JIANYIN

Claimants

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

DCM SERVICES ON BEHALF OF VERIZON WIRELESS

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Decedent

LI JOHN R.

Not Classified By Court

BETHEL STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALKANA EUGENE STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

2/22/2022: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

3/3/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Creditor's Claim - -On Behalf of American Express National Bank

3/15/2022: Creditor's Claim - -On Behalf of American Express National Bank

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities (Comment)

4/7/2022: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties and Liabilities (Comment)

Minute Order

4/4/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Publication

3/23/2022: Proof of Publication

Creditor's Claim

3/21/2022: Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim - -Capital One, N.A. Capital One Walmart Rewards Card

3/15/2022: Creditor's Claim - -Capital One, N.A. Capital One Walmart Rewards Card

Bond - Suretec Insurance Company

4/19/2022: Bond - Suretec Insurance Company

Letters (Initial)

4/19/2022: Letters (Initial)

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

4/15/2022: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • Hearing09/05/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketBond (Suretec Insurance Company ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Duties and Liabilities (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (-Capital One, N.A. Capital One Walmart Rewards Card ); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (-On Behalf of American Express National Bank ); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCM SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALKANA EUGENE STEVEN