This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 04:25:57 (UTC).

LEZAMA, LUZ MARIA VS MORALES, JOSE ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 09/19/2017 LEZAMA, LUZ MARIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MORALES, JOSE ANTONIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0826

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEZAMA LUZ MARIA

Respondent

MORALES JOSE ANTONIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less