Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2020 at 21:36:37 (UTC).

LEWIS, KIMBERLY S VS LEWIS, SANDRA

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 LEWIS, KIMBERLY S filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against LEWIS, SANDRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SKEBA, VALERIE L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0407

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SKEBA, VALERIE L.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LEWIS KIMBERLY S

LEWIS KIMBERLY SHENEE

Respondent

LEWIS SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

JIMENEZ CHELLEI GENOISE

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

5/20/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

6/12/2020: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Minute Order

6/12/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

5/20/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

5/20/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/29/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

4/29/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

4/29/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Civil Harassment

4/29/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

4/29/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Proof of Service

5/4/2020: Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Skeba, Valerie L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Skeba, Valerie L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less