This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 12:50:21 (UTC).

LEWIS COLICK VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 LEWIS COLICK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4975

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLICK LEWIS

Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SCHMIDT CHRISTINA PATRIZIA

Other Attorneys

ARGOS JASON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

3/1/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/3/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

2/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/8/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2024
  • Hearing02/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Lewis Colick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Lewis Colick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by Lewis Colick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Lewis Colick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Lewis Colick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lewis Colick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Lewis Colick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lewis Colick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lewis Colick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARGOS JASON NICHOLAS