This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2020 at 08:19:28 (UTC).

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP, A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP VS COUNTRY VILLA SERVICE CORP., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD SMITH LLP, A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COUNTRY VILLA SERVICE CORP , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0855

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP A LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

STEPHAN REISSMAN AS TRUSTEE OF THE REISSMAN FAMILY TRUST

REISSMAN STEPHAN

COUNTRY VILLA SERVICE CORP. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGLOFF MICHAEL B

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/30/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/30/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/11/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/11/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • Hearing02/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Hearing02/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP, a Limited Liability Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTRY VILLA SERVICE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP is a litigant