Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 01:49:06 (UTC).

LEVY LAUTER, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP VS BOP MARINA TOWERS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 LEVY LAUTER, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BOP MARINA TOWERS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3244

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LEVY LAUTER LLP

RICHARD J. LAUTER & COMPANY LLP

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BOP MARINA TOWERS LLC

MDR BUILDING INVESTMENTS LLC

OVERLAND MARINA TOWER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

GOLD GEOFFREY M.

Defendant Attorney

LAW ALLISON J.

 

Court Documents

Request - REQUEST JOINT REQUEST TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6

6/22/2021: Request - REQUEST JOINT REQUEST TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6

Request for Dismissal

6/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/14/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail

2/9/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/9/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/10/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

2/10/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/10/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/26/2021: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • Hearing07/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Levy Lauter, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Levy Lauter, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketRequest (JOINT REQUEST TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6); Filed by Bop Marina Towers, LLC (Defendant); MDR Building Investments, LLC (Defendant); Overland Marina Tower, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Levy Lauter, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Bop Marina Towers, LLC (Defendant); MDR Building Investments, LLC (Defendant); Overland Marina Tower, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Levy Lauter, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bop Marina Towers, LLC (Defendant); MDR Building Investments, LLC (Defendant); Overland Marina Tower, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Bop Marina Towers, LLC (Defendant); MDR Building Investments, LLC (Defendant); Overland Marina Tower, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Bop Marina Towers, LLC (Defendant); MDR Building Investments, LLC (Defendant); Overland Marina Tower, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Levy Lauter, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Levy Lauter, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Levy Lauter, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Levy Lauter, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Levy Lauter, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Levy Lauter, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLD GEOFFREY M. ESQ.