This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2021 at 15:09:12 (UTC).

LEVONNA LACY VS LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 LEVONNA LACY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4029

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LACY LEVONNA

Defendant

LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROFAEL JOHN

Defendant Attorney

SWINDELLS PAMELA

Other Attorneys

YEAGER KENNETH C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/28/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

12/28/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

12/28/2020: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

3/17/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

12/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

12/14/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/17/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2023
  • Hearing11/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Hearing05/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Hearing05/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Levonna Lacy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Long Beach Public Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Long Beach Public Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Long Beach Public Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Levonna Lacy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Levonna Lacy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Levonna Lacy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Levonna Lacy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH PUBLIC TRANSPORATION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH