This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2023 at 05:22:17 (UTC).

LEVON FITILCHYAN, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, GALINA ARZUMANOVA, ET AL. VS JOSHUA KEMPER, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, MICHAEL KEMPER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 LEVON FITILCHYAN, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, GALINA ARZUMANOVA, filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSHUA KEMPER, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENTS, MICHAEL KEMPER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JILL FEENEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9872

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARZUMANOVA GALINA

FITILCHYAN LEVON

Defendants

KEMPER MICHAEL

KEMPER JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KACHATOORIAN HOV J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DOWNES PATRICK NORTON ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION - NO MINOR INVOLVED

3/14/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION - NO MINOR INVOLVED

Notice of Settlement

2/15/2023: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: FSC

2/15/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: FSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer

11/14/2022: Answer

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/26/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMEND...)

10/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMEND...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

10/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Witness List - JOINT TRIAL WITNESS LIST

10/25/2022: Witness List - JOINT TRIAL WITNESS LIST

Exhibit List - JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST

10/25/2022: Exhibit List - JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/21/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/31/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY

8/31/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Demand for Jury Trial

8/15/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION OF MARIE-SOPHIE REVAULT

7/19/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION OF MARIE-SOPHIE REVAULT

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st) - NO MINOR'S INVOLVED.: Name Extension changed from (1st) to (1st) - NO MINOR'S INVOLVED. ; As To Parties changed from Joshua Kemper, a minor, by and through his parents, Michael Kemper (Defendant) to Joshua Kemper, a minor, by and through his parents, Michael Kemper (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement UNCONDITIONAL NOTICE: Name Extension changed from UNCONDITIONAL NOTICE - MINOR PLAINTIFF to UNCONDITIONAL NOTICE ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION - NO MINOR INVOLVED: Name Extension: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION - NO MINOR INVOLVED ; As To Parties changed from Joshua Kemper (Defendant) to Joshua Kemper (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Levon Fitilchyan, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Galina Arzumanova, et al. on 10/26/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Levon Fitilchyan as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions in the Amount of $500.00 Should Not Be Imposed Against Counsel for Plaintiff for Failure to File a Notice of Settlement scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketConference Re: Pro Hac Vice Status of Attorney Marie-Sophie Revault / Renewal / Payment of $500.00 Pro Hac Vice Fees scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Levon Fitilchyan (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Kemper (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions in the Amount of $500.00 Should Not Be Imposed Against Counsel for Plaintiff for Failure to File a Notice of Settlement scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Levon; Filed by: Levon Fitilchyan, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Galina Arzumanova (Plaintiff); Galina Arzumanova (Plaintiff); As to: Levon Fitilchyan, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Galina Arzumanova (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Levon Fitilchyan, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Galina Arzumanova (Plaintiff); Galina Arzumanova (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Kemper, a minor, by and through his parents, Michael Kemper (Defendant); Michael Kemper (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Levon Fitilchyan, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Galina Arzumanova (Plaintiff); Galina Arzumanova (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Kemper, a minor, by and through his parents, Michael Kemper (Defendant); Michael Kemper (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less