This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:19:56 (UTC).

LEVIN & MARGOLIN VS YONA ZADOK MANGOLI

Case Summary

On 02/26/2018 LEVIN MARGOLIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YONA ZADOK MANGOLI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8901

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVIN & MARGOLIN

Defendant

MANGOLI YONA ZADOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SKLAN JEFFREY

SKLAN JEFFREY FREDRICH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

Summons

2/26/2018: Summons

Complaint

2/26/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order

8/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/8/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

8/6/2018: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by LEVIN & MARGOLIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEN, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by LEVIN & MARGOLIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LEVIN & MARGOLIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by LEVIN & MARGOLIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVIN & MARGOLIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SKLAN JEFFREY F.