This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 01:00:46 (UTC).

LEVIN & MARGOLIN VS AUDRA MACCORKLE

Case Summary

On 05/23/2018 LEVIN MARGOLIN filed an Other lawsuit against AUDRA MACCORKLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT S. DRAPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3787

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT S. DRAPER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEVIN & MARGOLIN

Defendant and Respondent

MACCORKLE AUDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF LEVIN & MARGOLIN

BECK PAUL ALAN

COZINE TESS MARIE

Defendant Attorney

SALTZMAN MARK ELLIOTT ESQ.

Respondent Attorney

SALTZMAN MARK E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

10/15/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

10/25/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/23/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/3/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

PETITION TO CONFIRM, CORRECT, OR VACATE ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION)

7/17/2018: PETITION TO CONFIRM, CORRECT, OR VACATE ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD (ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION)

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

6/22/2018: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - CIVIL

6/5/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - CIVIL

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

6/6/2018: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

SUMMONS

5/23/2018: SUMMONS

PETITION TO CONFIRM, CORRECT, OR VACATE ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

5/23/2018: PETITION TO CONFIRM, CORRECT, OR VACATE ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • Request for Refund / Order; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Motion to Vacate or Alter Arbitration Award (CCP 1285 - 1287.6) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; Hearing on Mo...) of 05/21/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; Hearing on Mo...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Levin & Margolin (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Motion to Vacate or Alter Arbitration Award (CCP 1285 - 1287.6) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award; Hearing on Mo...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 78; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM, CORRECT, OR VACATE ATTORNEY-CLIENT FEE ARBITRATION AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEVIN & MARGOLIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK PAUL A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COZINE TESS MARIE