This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2021 at 01:55:54 (UTC).

LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL. VS RITMO LATINO WIRELESS, LLC, A NEW JERSEY LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RITMO LATINO WIRELESS, LLC, A NEW JERSEY LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9349

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HEKMATRAVAN FAMILY NORWALK LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

RITMO LATINO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RITMO LATINO WIRELESS LLC A NEW JERSEY LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDSBERG IAN S.

Defendant Attorney

ALLENDER DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/21/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/28/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

7/15/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

8/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/15/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

12/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); HEKMATRAVAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); HEKMATRAVAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); HEKMATRAVAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by RITMO LATINO WIRELESS, LLC, a New Jersey limited liability company (Defendant); RITMO LATINO, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RITMO LATINO WIRELESS, LLC, a New Jersey limited liability company (Defendant); RITMO LATINO, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); HEKMATRAVAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); HEKMATRAVAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LEVIAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); HEKMATRAVAN FAMILY NORWALK, LLC a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ritmo Latino Wireless LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HEKMATRAVAN FAMILY NORWALK LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant