This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 22:32:18 (UTC).

LEVEY, GERALD S., MD - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 LEVEY, GERALD S , MD - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1994

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BURKHARDT ROBIN LEVEY

LEVEY JOHN STUART

Decedent

LEVEY GERALD S. MD

Not Classified By Court

ACEVEDO CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KANIN MATTHEW DAVID

 

Court Documents

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

12/17/2021: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

Will Deposited - 12 pgs - Dated - 04/17/1997

12/21/2021: Will Deposited - 12 pgs - Dated - 04/17/1997

Will Deposited - 1st Codicil 2 pgs - Dated - 10/25/2002

12/21/2021: Will Deposited - 1st Codicil 2 pgs - Dated - 10/25/2002

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

12/23/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication

1/3/2022: Proof of Publication

Supplement

1/19/2022: Supplement

Minute Order

1/24/2022: Minute Order

Will - Admitted

1/24/2022: Will - Admitted

Codicil - Admitted

1/24/2022: Codicil - Admitted

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative(s) (DE-147)

1/26/2022: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative - Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative(s) (DE-147)

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

2/1/2022: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

2/8/2022: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Bond - US Specialty

2/8/2022: Bond - US Specialty

Letters (Initial)

2/9/2022: Letters (Initial)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2023
  • Hearing06/19/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketBond (US Specialty ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Supplement to Duties (John S. Levey) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Supplement to Duties (Robin L. Burkhardt) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Duties & Liabilities of Personal Representative(s) (DE-147) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCodicil (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSupplement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketWill Deposited (12 pgs - Dated - 04/17/1997 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketWill Deposited (1st Codicil 2 pgs - Dated - 10/25/2002 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANIN MATTHEW DAVID