This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2022 at 09:00:38 (UTC).

LETICIA CASTRO ENRIQUEZ, ET AL. VS GARDNER TRUCKING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 LETICIA CASTRO ENRIQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARDNER TRUCKING, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4275

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CASTRO ENRIQUEZ LETICIA

MARTINEZ CASTRO NANCY

Defendants

CRST EXPEDITED INC.

GARDNER TRUCKING INC.

LOPEZ JUAN HUMBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERSHATSKI ERIC S

Defendant Attorney

CANADA RICHARD BRENT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/3/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

12/3/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/13/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/29/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Demand for Jury Trial

1/19/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

1/19/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) PARTIAL

1/6/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) PARTIAL

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2024
  • Hearing12/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • Hearing05/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Eric S Bershatski (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Gardner Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Juan Humberto Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gardner Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Juan Humberto Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((Without Prejudice) Partial); Filed by Leticia Castro Enriquez (Plaintiff); Nancy Martinez Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leticia Castro Enriquez (Plaintiff); Nancy Martinez Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leticia Castro Enriquez (Plaintiff); Nancy Martinez Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Leticia Castro Enriquez (Plaintiff); Nancy Martinez Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leticia Castro Enriquez (Plaintiff); Nancy Martinez Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leticia Castro Enriquez (Plaintiff); Nancy Martinez Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Leticia Castro Enriquez (Plaintiff); Nancy Martinez Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDNER TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CRST Expedited, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANADA RICHARD BRENT