Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 12:29:44 (UTC).

LESTER PASCUAL VS CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 LESTER PASCUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1549

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PASCUAL LESTER

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

AMAYA JIMMIE

DOES 1 TO 30

CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE

ALMADA GERALDINE

TRIMMING LAND CO. INC.

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE

ALMADA GERALDINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ELLIS ANDREW L. ESQ.

ELLIS ANDREW LAWRENCE ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

D'ORO FRANK J. ESQ.

ASH PAUL V. ESQ.

ASH PAUL VAUGHN ESQ.

D'ORO FRANK JOSEPH JR. ESQ.

FERRANTE DAVID MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

D'ORO FRANK J. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ASH PAUL VAUGHN ESQ.

FERRANTE DAVID MICHAEL ESQ.

FERRANTE DAVID MICHAEL

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FERRANTE DAVID MICHAEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -,NOT ENTERED

7/17/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -,NOT ENTERED

Notice of Ruling

7/17/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (AS TO REMAINI...)

7/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (AS TO REMAINI...)

Request for Dismissal

4/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 01/23/2020

1/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 01/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

1/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

12/16/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/5/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/9/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING FOR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL.....TAKEN OFF CALENDAR PURSUANT TO TELEPHONIC REQUEST OF THE MOVI

6/26/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING FOR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE TRIAL.....TAKEN OFF CALENDAR PURSUANT TO TELEPHONIC REQUEST OF THE MOVI

Motion for Summary Judgment

7/12/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MSJ AS AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/12/2019: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MSJ AS AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT GERALDINE ALMADA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JU...)

9/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT GERALDINE ALMADA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JU...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEFENDANT GERALDINE ALMADA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JU...) OF 09/26/2019

9/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEFENDANT GERALDINE ALMADA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JU...) OF 09/26/2019

CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/13/2018: CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/25/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((as to Remaining Cross-Complaint of Geraldine Almada - 06/25/2018)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Geraldine Almada (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((as to Remaining Cross-Complaint of Geraldine Almada - 06/25/2018)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (-,not entered); Filed by Lester Pascual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by City of South El Monte (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (as to Remaini...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lester Pascual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Lester Pascual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 09:48 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of South El Monte (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketCITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lester Pascual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Lester Pascual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lester Pascual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIMMING LAND CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASH PAUL V.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRANTE DAVID MICHAEL