This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2022 at 12:04:42 (UTC).

LESLY TAMARA BONILLA VS ELISA OBANDO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 LESLY TAMARA BONILLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ELISA OBANDO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3567

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BONILLA LESLY TAMARA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

900 SOUTH FIGUEROA STREET APARTMENTS INVESTORS LLC

APARTMENT INVESTORS IV INC.

APARTMENT INVESTORS IV LTD. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

GREYSTAR CALIFORNIA INC.

GREYSTAR HOLDINGS INC.

GREYSTAR REAL ESTATE PARTNERS LLC

KENT SECURITY OF CALIFORNIA INC.

OBANDO ELISA

UBS REALTY INVESTORS LLC

Cross Defendant and Defendant

KENT SECURITY OF CALIFORNIA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARZBAN MICHAEL M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE

HOYNACKI DAVID ANDREW

KIM SUE H.

Cross Defendant Attorney

LAWSON DEREK THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/21/2022: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

10/20/2022: Answer

Answer

10/20/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/20/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

7/6/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Answer

3/28/2022: Answer

Answer

3/11/2022: Answer

Answer

3/7/2022: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/7/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

11/29/2021: Complaint

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2024
  • Hearing11/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Kent Security of California, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); As to: Greystar Holdings, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Greystar California, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC (Defendant); Greystar California, Inc. (Defendant); Greystar Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Lesly Tamara Bonilla (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC (Defendant); Greystar California, Inc. (Defendant); Greystar Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Kent Security of California, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC (Defendant); Greystar California, Inc. (Defendant); Greystar Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Kent Security of California, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: UBS Realty Investors LLC (Defendant); As to: Lesly Tamara Bonilla (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Michelle Marie DeMaio (Attorney): First Name changed from B. Otis to Michelle; Last Name changed from Felder to DeMaio; Organization Name changed from WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP to Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker; Middle Name: Marie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAddress for Michelle Marie DeMaio (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lesly Tamara Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: Elisa Obando (Defendant); 900 South Figueroa Street Apartments Investors LLC (Defendant); Apartment Investors IV, LTD., A California Limited Partnership (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lesly Tamara Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: 900 South Figueroa Street Apartments Investors LLC (Defendant); Apartment Investors IV, LTD., A California Limited Partnership (Defendant); Apartment Investors IV, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lesly Tamara Bonilla (Plaintiff); As to: 900 South Figueroa Street Apartments Investors LLC (Defendant); Apartment Investors IV, LTD., A California Limited Partnership (Defendant); Apartment Investors IV, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KENT SECURITY OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Greystar Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBS REALTY INVESTORS LLC A MASSACHUSETTS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where 900 SOUTH FIGUEROA STREET APARTMENTS INVESTORS LLC is a litigant