This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 06:28:00 (UTC).

LESLIE SANDERS VS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 LESLIE SANDERS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2621

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDERS LESLIE

Defendants

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

COLEMAN MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYES BRADLEY G

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

5/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/15/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2024
  • Hearing03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leslie Sanders (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leslie Sanders (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Leslie Sanders (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leslie Sanders (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES BRADLEY G