This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 15:03:53 (UTC).

LESLIE PATON, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 LESLIE PATON filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM and WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7134

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATON LESLIE

PATON PHILIP

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRIDGFORD RICHARD KEVIN

FRANTZ JAMES P.

MCNICHOLAS JOHN PATRICK IV

Defendant Attorney

RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO ALLOW...)

11/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO ALLOW...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY AS TO EDISO...)

12/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY AS TO EDISO...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS FOR AN ORDER WAIVING NOTICE FOR PLAINITF...)

12/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS FOR AN ORDER WAIVING NOTICE FOR PLAINITF...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO CONTI...)

10/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO CONTI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CLAI...)

7/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CLAI...)

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/2/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/2/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-EIGHTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

6/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-EIGHTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTY-EIGHTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION

5/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTY-EIGHTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

5/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 2:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings For an Order Waiving Notice For Plainitf...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Termination of Stay) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on January 18, 2022) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: why the stay on discovery as to Ediso...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on January 18, 2022) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Termination of Stay) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Order RE: Twenty-Eighth Petition For Coordination Of Add-On Cases; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on September 1, 2021.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why the st...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Submission of Twenty-Eighth Petition for Coordination); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 12:02 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 05/14/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leslie Paton (Plaintiff); Philip Paton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leslie Paton (Plaintiff); Philip Paton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANTZ JAMES PATRICK