This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2021 at 11:49:48 (UTC).

LESLIE MIRANDA, ET AL. VS 7 STAR LOGISTICS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 LESLIE MIRANDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 7 STAR LOGISTICS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK C. KIM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6571

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VASQUEZ OSCAR ALBERTICO MIRANDA

VASQUEZ MAYRA ROSIBEL MIRANDA

NAPPI OFELIA MARIELA

MIRANDA LESLIE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THREE COUNTRIES LOGISTICS INC.

TOTAL TERMINALS INTERNATIONAL LLC

RODRIGUEZ MIGUEL A.

7 STAR LOGISTICS INC.

ROVAR PROPERTIES LLC

FLEXI-VAN LEASING INC.

CHASSIS MANAGEMENT SERVICES SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC.

PACIFIC MARITIME ASSOCIATION

CRUZ JORGE H.

TRITON CONTAINER INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED OF NORTH AMERICA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

7 STAR LOGISTICS INC.

ROES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAFFNER JOSHUA H.

WEINBERG TREVOR

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WISE ERICH PAUL

MILLER JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

12/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

12/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMP

12/16/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMP

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

11/23/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/23/2020: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

11/18/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/18/2020: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/18/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Cross-Complaint

11/5/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/5/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Leslie MIranda (Plaintiff); Ofelia Mariela Nappi (Plaintiff); Mayra Rosibel Miranda Vasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Leslie MIranda (Plaintiff); Ofelia Mariela Nappi (Plaintiff); Mayra Rosibel Miranda Vasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMP); Filed by Triton Container International Incorporated of North America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27, Mark C. Kim, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Total Terminals International, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Total Terminals International, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leslie MIranda (Plaintiff); Ofelia Mariela Nappi (Plaintiff); Mayra Rosibel Miranda Vasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Leslie MIranda (Plaintiff); Ofelia Mariela Nappi (Plaintiff); Mayra Rosibel Miranda Vasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leslie MIranda (Plaintiff); Ofelia Mariela Nappi (Plaintiff); Mayra Rosibel Miranda Vasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Leslie MIranda (Plaintiff); Ofelia Mariela Nappi (Plaintiff); Mayra Rosibel Miranda Vasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Leslie MIranda (Plaintiff); Ofelia Mariela Nappi (Plaintiff); Mayra Rosibel Miranda Vasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leslie MIranda (Plaintiff); Ofelia Mariela Nappi (Plaintiff); Mayra Rosibel Miranda Vasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leslie MIranda (Plaintiff); Ofelia Mariela Nappi (Plaintiff); Mayra Rosibel Miranda Vasquez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRITON CONTAINER INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED OF NORTH AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where THREE COUNTRIES LOGISTICS INC. is a litigant