This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2022 at 21:16:49 (UTC).

LESLIE HERNANDEZ VS WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 LESLIE HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9863

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ LESLIE

Defendants

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A CORPORATION

HANKEY CAPITAL LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HANKEY GROUP A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM JACE H

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/21/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2021

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/25/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice - NOTICE PROOF OF SERVICE AND NOTICE OF CONTINUE HEARING

6/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE PROOF OF SERVICE AND NOTICE OF CONTINUE HEARING

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/28/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TONIA DOUGLAS

3/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TONIA DOUGLAS

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING FEDERAL AUTHORITIES

3/18/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING FEDERAL AUTHORITIES

Motion to Compel Arbitration

3/18/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION F MICHELLE COOPER

3/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION F MICHELLE COOPER

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Leslie Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (and for Staying Proceedings) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (PROOF OF SERVICE AND NOTICE OF CONTINUE HEARING); Filed by Leslie Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 4:05 PM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Binding Arbitration); Filed by WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); HANKEY CAPITAL, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES, a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (f Michelle Cooper); Filed by WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); HANKEY CAPITAL, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES, a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leslie Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leslie Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leslie Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Leslie Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leslie Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leslie Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANKEY GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where HANKEY CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant