This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 08:45:41 (UTC).

LESLIE DE LAZARO, ET AL. VS NETTUNO LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 LESLIE DE LAZARO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NETTUNO LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6881

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HIBDON KIMBERLY

RODRIGUEZ NANCY

DE LAZARO LESLIE

DE LAZARO DANIEL

RODRIGUEZ BRENDA

RODRIGUEZ MAX

Defendants

HARSHAD DHAROD AS STRUSTT OF THE DHAROD FAMILY TRUST

NETTUNO LLC

SILVER STAR REAL ESTATE LLC

TMB ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LERNER NEER

Defendant Attorneys

PETERSON RICK L.

GASPARIAN MARAL I.

REAGAN BARRY JAMES

PARTIDA GUILLERMO ENGELBERT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/16/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/24/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

7/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Declaration - DECLARATION DEC. OF PARTIDA RE MEET AND CONFER AND EXT. OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

8/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DEC. OF PARTIDA RE MEET AND CONFER AND EXT. OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Answer

8/27/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/17/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Association of Attorney

9/17/2020: Association of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

3/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Association of Attorney

12/3/2020: Association of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2023
  • Hearing07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Hearing01/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Hearing12/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Leslie De Lazaro (Plaintiff); Leslie De Lazaro (Plaintiff); Daniel De Lazaro (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Nettuno LLC (Defendant); SILVER STAR REAL ESTATE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Nettuno LLC (Defendant); SILVER STAR REAL ESTATE, LLC (Defendant); HARSHAD DHAROD, AS STRUSTT OF THE DHAROD FAMILY TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Nettuno LLC (Defendant); SILVER STAR REAL ESTATE, LLC (Defendant); HARSHAD DHAROD, AS STRUSTT OF THE DHAROD FAMILY TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Dec. of Partida re meet and confer and ext. of time to file responsive pleading); Filed by Nettuno LLC (Defendant); SILVER STAR REAL ESTATE, LLC (Defendant); HARSHAD DHAROD, AS STRUSTT OF THE DHAROD FAMILY TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nettuno LLC (Defendant); SILVER STAR REAL ESTATE, LLC (Defendant); HARSHAD DHAROD, AS STRUSTT OF THE DHAROD FAMILY TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Leslie De Lazaro (Plaintiff); Daniel De Lazaro (Plaintiff); Kimberly Hibdon (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leslie De Lazaro (Plaintiff); Leslie De Lazaro (Plaintiff); Daniel De Lazaro (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leslie De Lazaro (Plaintiff); Leslie De Lazaro (Plaintiff); Daniel De Lazaro (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER STAR REAL ESTATE LLC. AN ALASKA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TMB ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIDA GUILLERMO ENGELBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON RICK