This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2020 at 01:13:43 (UTC).

LESLIE A DAVIS VS PAUL C TYO

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 LESLIE A DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PAUL C TYO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6691

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DAVIS LESLIE A.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

TYO PAUL C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MCGHEE PERFISITY ATTORNEY AT LAW

MCGHEE PERFISITY

Defendant Attorneys

DEENIHAN MATTHEW J. ESQ.

DEENIHAN MATTHEW JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/11/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE) OF 04/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE)

Notice of Settlement

1/24/2020: Notice of Settlement

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/4/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...) OF 01/07/2020

1/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...) OF 01/07/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

1/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Other - - Demand for Jury Trial

9/13/2018: Other - - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer -

9/13/2018: Answer -

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Res

12/24/2018: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Res

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Ans

12/24/2018: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Ans

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Notice of Ruling

3/1/2019: Notice of Ruling

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/30/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

SUMMONS -

3/5/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/5/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Leslie A. Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Paul C. Tyo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docketat 11:16 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Continuance)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Continuance) of 04/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Leslie A. Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Answers to Form Interrogatories); Filed by Paul C. Tyo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Answers to Special Interrogatories); Filed by Paul C. Tyo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents); Filed by Paul C. Tyo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Paul C. Tyo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Paul C. Tyo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leslie A. Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696691    Hearing Date: January 07, 2020    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

LESLIE A. DAVIS,

Plaintiff,

v.

PAUL C. TYO, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC696691

Hearing Date: January 7, 2020

[Tentative] order RE:

Defendant’S motions TO Compel RESPONSES

Plaintiff Leslie A. Davis (“Plaintiff”) filed this premises liability action against Defendant Paul C. Tyo (“Defendant”) on March 5, 2018. Then, on December 4, 2019, Defendant filed motions to compel responses from Plaintiff to: (1) Supplemental Request for Production of Documents, Set One and (2) Supplemental Interrogatories, Set One. Defendant served the discovery requests on October 15, 2019. As of the date of counsel’s declaration dated December 4, 2019, Defendant has not received responses from Plaintiff. Plaintiff has not filed any oppositions to Defendant’s motions, and there is nothing in the record to suggest that Plaintiff has complied with the discovery requests. Therefore, the motions are granted.

Defendant also seeks monetary sanctions against Plaintiff and her counsel-of-record in the amount of $410 for one motion and $585 for the other motion. The Court finds that the failure to respond to discovery requests constitutes an abuse of the discovery process warranting sanctions, and these amounts are reasonable under the circumstances.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motions to compel responses to the Supplemental Request for Production of Documents and Supplemental Interrogatories are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, on or before January 20, 2020. Plaintiff and her counsel of record shall pay sanctions in the amount of $995, jointly and severally, on or before January 20, 2020. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 7, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court