Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 16:37:16 (UTC).

LEONIECE ALLEN VS AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 LEONIECE ALLEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8195

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN LEONIECE

Defendants

AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES

OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

CITY LIFT BUILDING SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZELNER BARRY S

Defendant Attorneys

WEBER CHRISTOPHER J.

LOVE AVRIL G.

BROSAMLE ANTHONY DEAN

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

7/1/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

12/16/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

1/7/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

1/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/7/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/21/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/24/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/24/2019: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • Hearing10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Hearing10/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Hearing10/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Final Status Conference and Trial); Filed by AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES (Defendant); OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Continue Trial And All Related Dates); Filed by AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES (Defendant); OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES (Defendant); OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LEONIECE ALLEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LEONIECE ALLEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LEONIECE ALLEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LEONIECE ALLEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LEONIECE ALLEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LEONIECE ALLEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMTECH ELEVATOR SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZELNER BARRY S