Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 01:33:40 (UTC).

LEONIDES SECO VS WESTERN DENTAL AND ORTHODONTICS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 LEONIDES SECO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WESTERN DENTAL AND ORTHODONTICS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7602

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECO LEONIDES

Defendants

GUIND AWNY DDS

WESTERN DENTAL AND ORTHODONTICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LUCERO LINDA

LUCERO LINDA DARLENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT TRIAL FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 04/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Leonides Seco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Leonides Seco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leonides Seco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leonides Seco (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN DENTAL & ORTHODONTICS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA DARLENE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA