This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 04:30:01 (UTC).

LEONID TEPLITSKY VS. ILANA MALARAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 LEONID TEPLITSKY filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ILANA MALARAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH A. LIPPITT, LAURA A. MATZ and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5154

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH A. LIPPITT

LAURA A. MATZ

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEPLITSKY LEONID

Defendants

4600 GROUP LLC

DOES 1-50

MALARAN ILANA

STANLEY AZRILYAN

RX INGREDIENTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

AZRILYAN STANLEY

AZRILYAN DEANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REVITZ STEVEN JEROME

RAISKIN & REVITZ

Defendant Attorneys

SPEISER ELLIOTT R

ELLIOTT R. SPEISER & ASSOCIATES

SIGELMAN/PERLMAN LAW FIRM

STANTON LEE PHILIPS

PHILLIPS STANTON LEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/26/2017: Complaint

Declaration

7/10/2018: Declaration

Declaration

7/31/2018: Declaration

Declaration

8/1/2018: Declaration

Other -

8/1/2018: Other -

Reply

8/3/2018: Reply

Notice

8/10/2018: Notice

Stipulation

8/16/2018: Stipulation

Notice of Motion

8/16/2018: Notice of Motion

Order

8/17/2018: Order

Unknown

8/21/2018: Unknown

Other -

8/22/2018: Other -

Notice of Motion

8/23/2018: Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion

8/27/2018: Notice of Motion

Motion re:

10/12/2018: Motion re:

Notice

10/16/2018: Notice

Motion re:

10/18/2018: Motion re:

Response

10/26/2018: Response

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Leonid Teplitsky (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Regarding Criminal Proceedings and Necessit...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases (EC065795 ); Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Leonid Teplitsky (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Pending Action; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Leonid Teplitsky (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leonid Teplitsky (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Leonid Teplitsky (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5154    Hearing Date: December 11, 2020    Dept: E

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

[CCP ;284, CRC 3.1362]

Date: 12/11/20 (8:30 AM)

Case: Leonid Teplitsky v. Ilana Malaran et al. (****5154)

Counsel Darrick V. Tan, Esq.’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for defendant RX Ingredients, Inc. is GRANTED. The Court will sign the Order and counsel will be relieved effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the signed order upon the client.

Defendant RX Ingredients, Inc. is ordered to appear on April 14, 2021, at 8:30 AM, in Department E and show cause why its Answer to the operative First Amended Complaint should not be stricken on account of its status as an unrepresented corporate entity.