This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 01:52:58 (UTC).

LEONEL HERNANDEZ ET AL VS EQUITY RESIDENTIAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 LEONEL HERNANDEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EQUITY RESIDENTIAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL FEUER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0125

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GAIL FEUER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MATA MERLYN

HERNANDEZ LEONEL

Defendants

KIM SUZY

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

COOK PHILIP E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/12/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW; ETC

1/12/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW; ETC

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

1/12/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

1/12/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/22/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE; OSC

5/21/2018: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE; OSC

Minute Order

5/7/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

5/1/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.

4/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE; OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Leonel Hernandez (Plaintiff); Merlyn Mata (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leonel Hernandez (Plaintiff); Merlyn Mata (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Philip E. Cook (State Bar No. 149067) pcook@cooklawfirm.la

THE COOK LAW FIRM, P.C.

707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90017 ‘ FILED

Telephone: (213) 988-6100

Facsimile: (213) 988-6099

Superior Coypt of California Countv of Log Angeles

APR 12 2018

ffeus whecunve Urticer/Clerk of Court

' Deputy

Anne Richardson (State Bar No. 151541) "~ Sherri g arichardson@publiccounsel.org ‘

Ritu Mahajan (State Bar No. 252970) By, rmahajan@publiccounsel.org

PUBLIC COUNSEL

610 South Ardmore Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90005

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA — FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

LEONEL HERNANDEZ, an individual, and Case No. BC690125 /lg MERLYN MATA, an individual, Plaintiffs, PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT

VS. EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL, a publicly traded, a Maryland real estate investment trust; EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, L.L.C,a Delaware limited liability company; SUZY KIM, an individual; and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

Defendants.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Residential Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOK PHILIP EARL