This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2019 at 02:43:39 (UTC).

LEONEL CORNEJO VS BILL NIKOLOPOULOS

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 LEONEL CORNEJO filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against BILL NIKOLOPOULOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5231

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Appellants

NIKOLOPOULOS BILL

PALM'S FAMILY RESTAURANT

Defendant

CORNEJO LEONEL

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

GLICK STEPHEN BRADLEY ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

CERVIK ANDREW BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY--LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

10/3/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY--LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

Case Management Statement

1/9/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice

1/9/2019: Notice

Notice

1/8/2019: Notice

Substitution of Attorney

10/12/2018: Substitution of Attorney

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF APPEAL

9/26/2018: NOTICE OF APPEAL

Minute Order

4/18/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

4/16/2019: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

3/29/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

3/29/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/24/2019: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/24/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Certificate of Mailing for

6/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

6/18/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

6/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

6/18/2019: Minute Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Leonel Cornejo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 06/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( OF COUNSEL IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL); Filed by Leonel Cornejo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Marco Neilly, #13564)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Leonel Cornejo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketNotice (Amended Notice of Expanded Claims); Filed by Leonel Cornejo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Expanded Claims); Filed by Leonel Cornejo (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Andrew Bradley Cervik (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY--LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Appeal; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant