This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2023 at 00:06:20 (UTC).

LEONARDO ZARAGOZA CHAVEZ, ET AL. VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 LEONARDO ZARAGOZA CHAVEZ, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0165

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VALENCIA GARCIA ADRIANA

ZARAGOZA CHAVEZ LEONARDO

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CRANDALL SEAN

WOOD CAREY B.

Defendant Attorney

HOM BRIAN M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/27/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/27/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/6/2023: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/24/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Motion to Compel Arbitration

3/29/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VANESSA V. DAO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE PROCEEDINGS

3/29/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VANESSA V. DAO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR AN ORDER STAYING THE PROCEEDINGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2023
  • Hearing10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • Hearing07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Leonardo Zaragoza Chavez (Plaintiff); Adriana Valencia Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Vanessa V. Dao in Support of Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and for an Order Staying the Proceedings; Filed by: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketAddress for Sean Crandall (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Sean Crandall (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Leonardo Zaragoza Chavez (Plaintiff); Adriana Valencia Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Leonardo Zaragoza Chavez (Plaintiff); Adriana Valencia Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 02/03/2023; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark C. Kim in Department S27 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Leonardo Zaragoza Chavez (Plaintiff); Adriana Valencia Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Leonardo Zaragoza Chavez (Plaintiff); Adriana Valencia Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Leonardo Zaragoza Chavez (Plaintiff); Adriana Valencia Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less