This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2019 at 01:28:25 (UTC).

LEONARDO CHOMI ET AL VS JAMES ANTHONY STARTZ

Case Summary

On 05/03/2018 LEONARDO CHOMI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAMES ANTHONY STARTZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4940

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHOMI MARK

CHOMI LEONARDO

Defendant

STARTZ JAMES ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTTMAN J BRUCE

8230 Beverly Blvd #14

Los Angeles, CA 90048

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/13/2019: Minute Order

Affidavit

2/21/2019: Affidavit

Writ of Execution

2/22/2019: Writ of Execution

Affidavit of Identity and Order

3/21/2019: Affidavit of Identity and Order

Notice of Ruling

12/26/2018: Notice of Ruling

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/26/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Entry of Judgment

12/26/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for

12/18/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Declaration

12/18/2018: Declaration

Judgment

12/18/2018: Judgment

Other -

12/18/2018: Other -

Other -

12/18/2018: Other -

Minute Order

12/18/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

12/18/2018: Request for Dismissal

Other -

12/18/2018: Other -

RULING

9/18/2018: RULING

Minute Order

9/18/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/11/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Identity and Order; Filed by Leonardo Chomi (Plaintiff); Mark Chomi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Leonardo Chomi (Plaintiff); Mark Chomi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketAffidavit (of Post Judgment Interest (C.C.P. 685.050)); Filed by Leonardo Chomi (Plaintiff); Mark Chomi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Leonardo Chomi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD (FALSE PROMISE); ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leonardo Chomi (Plaintiff); Mark Chomi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less