This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 04:08:21 (UTC).

LEON-VALLE, CASSANDRA M VS LEON, ELVIN

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 LEON-VALLE, CASSANDRA M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LEON, ELVIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1371

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEON-VALLE CASSANDRA M

Respondent

LEON ELVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ACOSTA MARIELYS CAROLYN

Respondent Attorney

FELIX EDNA

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/1/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

9/1/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Declaration - Income and Expense

9/1/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Summons

9/1/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/1/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

9/1/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

9/1/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Proof of Service of Summons - Served 09/08/21

9/22/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Served 09/08/21

Declaration - UCCJEA

10/8/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

10/8/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - Income and Expense

10/8/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Served 09/08/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACOSTA MARIELYS CAROLYN