This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2022 at 01:28:13 (UTC).

LEON THOMPSON, JR VS WILLIAM S. JENSEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 LEON THOMPSON, JR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM S JENSEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1950

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON LEON JR

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT

COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1-50

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A NEBRASKA CORPORATION

FORWARD SUNSET INC . A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY

JENSEN WILLIAM S.

LAFA ESTHER MARIE

MOSS WILLIAM BILL

WEST COAST ESCROW COMPANY AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAPERO SARAH ELIZABETH

MOBLEY FELICIA

Defendant Attorney

DEAL CHRISTOPHER E.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

5/18/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

5/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT) OF 05/12/2022

5/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT) OF 05/12/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT)

5/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/20/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE...) OF 05/04/2022

5/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE...) OF 05/04/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE...)

5/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER E. DEAL IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINTDECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER E. DEAL IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMERICAN

4/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER E. DEAL IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINTDECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER E. DEAL IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMERICAN

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/20/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/20/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRICIA A. PHAM RE: MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(A)(2)

3/21/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRICIA A. PHAM RE: MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(A)(2)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING 90 DAY STAY OF ACTION

3/2/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING 90 DAY STAY OF ACTION

Substitution of Attorney

3/10/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

1/24/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE RECORDING OF ANY FORECLOSURE RELATED DOCUMENTS

2/4/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE RECORDING OF ANY FORECLOSURE RELATED DOCUMENTS

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/4/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/4/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/4/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Hearing06/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by First American Title Insurance Company, a Nebraska Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF HEARING ON FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT); Filed by First American Title Insurance Company, a Nebraska Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Hearing on Demurrer to Complaint) of 05/12/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Hearing on Demurrer to Complaint)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE...) of 05/04/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Leon Thompson, Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Leon Thompson, Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Leon Thompson, Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE RECORDING OF ANY FORECLOSURE RELATED DOCUMENTS; Filed by Leon Thompson, Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Leon Thompson, Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leon Thompson, Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leon Thompson, Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Leon Thompson, Jr (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORWARD SUNSET INC. DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPERO, SARAH E