This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 16:53:05 (UTC).

LEOKADIA WILCZEK, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF PASADENA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 LEOKADIA WILCZEK, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF PASADENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3174

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILCZEK AN INDIVIDUAL LEOKADIA

Defendants

CITY OF PASADENA

KIRST ROBERT M. AN INDIVIDUAL

PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISON OWILI K.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/23/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

PI General Order

7/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2024
  • Hearing06/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Hearing12/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leokadia Wilczek, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Leokadia Wilczek, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leokadia Wilczek, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF PASADENA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eison, Owili K