This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2022 at 20:19:39 (UTC).

LEO POTUCEK, ET AL. VS JOHN L. HOSACK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 LEO POTUCEK filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against JOHN L HOSACK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3614

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CONDOR MANAGEMENT LLC

POTUCEK LEO

Defendants

BUCHALTER

HOSACK JOHN L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLEIN ROBERT G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION

10/11/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • Hearing11/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION); Filed by John L. Hosack (Defendant); Buchalter (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Leo Potucek (Plaintiff); Condor Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leo Potucek (Plaintiff); Condor Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leo Potucek (Plaintiff); Condor Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUCHALTER A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CONDOR MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLEIN, ROBERT G.