This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2023 at 00:33:03 (UTC).

LEO CORNICE VS CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 LEO CORNICE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9988

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNICE LEO

Defendant

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOFFS JESSE THOMAS

WISEMAN ALFRED J.

Defendant Attorney

LYNCH GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/14/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/26/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF T RIAL COUNSEL GREG ORY G. LYNCH, C O UNSEL FOR DEFEND ANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

11/3/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF T RIAL COUNSEL GREG ORY G. LYNCH, C O UNSEL FOR DEFEND ANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/3/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/3/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/3/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); As to: LEO CORNICE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDeclaration OF T RIAL COUNSEL GREG ORY G. LYNCH, C O UNSEL FOR DEFEND ANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER; Filed by: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LEO CORNICE (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); Service Date: 10/04/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LEO CORNICE (Plaintiff); As to: Alfred J. Wiseman (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAddress for Jesse Thomas Hoffs (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LEO CORNICE (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LEO CORNICE (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David Sotelo in Department 40 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WISEMAN ALFRED J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOFFS JESSE