This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 10:32:48 (UTC).

LENORA YOU VS RITE AID ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 LENORA YOU filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RITE AID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS and DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4662

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LENORA YOU

YOU LENORA

Respondents and Defendants

THRIFTY PAYLESS INC

AGENT FOR THRIFTY PAYLESS

DOES 1 TO 100

BESCI SCOTT

RITE AID PAYROLL MANAGEMENT

RITE AID

THRIFTY PAYLESS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R. ESQ.

SHEGERIAN CARNEY RICHARD ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

JONATHAN A. KLEIN

HOCKEL THOMAS KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/14/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/16/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

2/28/2018: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/20/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Unknown

3/20/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/13/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/10/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF MELIS ATALAY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION. SET ONE

9/18/2018: DECLARATION OF MELIS ATALAY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION. SET ONE

DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFEY PAYLESS INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

9/18/2018: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFEY PAYLESS INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

DELARATION OF ANDREW BEGLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RITE AID CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

9/18/2018: DELARATION OF ANDREW BEGLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RITE AID CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THRWIEY PAYLESS INC.?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

9/18/2018: DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL THRWIEY PAYLESS INC.?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

DECLARATION OF MELIS ATALAY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

9/18/2018: DECLARATION OF MELIS ATALAY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL TIIRWFY PAYLESS, INC.?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

9/18/2018: DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL TIIRWFY PAYLESS, INC.?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

9/18/2018: DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFTY PAYLESS INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO GENERAL FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

9/20/2018: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFTY PAYLESS INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO GENERAL FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

DECLARATION OF MELIS ATALAY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY NO. 15.1, SET ONE

9/20/2018: DECLARATION OF MELIS ATALAY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY NO. 15.1, SET ONE

DECLARATION OF MELIS ATALAY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RITE CORP.'S FURTHER RESPONS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

9/20/2018: DECLARATION OF MELIS ATALAY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RITE CORP.'S FURTHER RESPONS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketOpposition (PLNTFF NON OPP MTN TO CONTINUE TRIAL (YOU)); Filed by Lenora You (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Thomas Hockel); Filed by Rite Aid (Defendant); Thrifty Payless Inc. (Defendant); Scott Besci (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Melis Atalay); Filed by Rite Aid (Defendant); Thrifty Payless Inc. (Defendant); Scott Besci (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by Rite Aid (Defendant); Thrifty Payless Inc. (Defendant); Scott Besci (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Thrifty Payless Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT RITE AID CORPORATION AND DEFENDANT THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC. TO PLAINTIFF LENORA YOU'S COOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lenora You (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF LENORA YOU'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4662    Hearing Date: August 05, 2020    Dept: 74

****4662 LENORA YOU vs RITE AID

Plaintiff Lenora You’s Motion to Strike Deposition

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion to strike the deposition of third-party Robert Leggings is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to seeking an authorized remedy. See CCP ;;435, 436, 437, 1987.1.



Case Number: ****4662    Hearing Date: August 13, 2020    Dept: 74

****4662 LENORA YOU vs RITE AID

Defendants Rite Aid Corporation and Thrifty Payless’ Motion to Compel Further Responses to Deposition Questions

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff is ordered to give a further response to questions 2 and 4. Both parties’ requests for sanctions are DENIED.

Questions 1, 3, 5 and 6 require Plaintiff to “sort out the factual material in the case according to specific legal contentions, and to do this by memory and on the spot.” As such, they are improper. Questions 2 and 4 are factual in nature and do not call for legal conclusions.



Case Number: ****4662    Hearing Date: October 08, 2020    Dept: 74

****4662 LENORA YOU vs RITE AID

Plaintiff’s Motion to Quash Third Party Deposition Subpoena (Beverly Hills Hotel)

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion to quash is GRANTED IN PART. Beverly Hills Hotel is ordered to designate and produce the officers, directors, managing agents or employees most qualified to testify on its behalf having knowledge of matters 1 and 4 and to produce documents responsive to categories (a), (e), and (g).

MATTERS

1. The dates that Beverly Hills Hotel employed Lenora Bejarano You;

4. The wages and/or commissions earned by Lenora Bejarano You while employed by Beverly Hills Hotel.

DOCUMENTS

(a) Job title;

(e) The actual compensation paid to her during her employment;

(g) Actual benefits provided to her during her employment.



Case Number: ****4662    Hearing Date: October 13, 2020    Dept: 74

****4662 LENORA YOU vs RITE AID

(1) Plaintiff’s Motion to Quash Third Party Deposition Subpoena (IHG Management, LLC)

(2) Plaintiff’s Motion to Quash Third Party Deposition Subpoena (WINPIN 85 Investments, LLC)

TENTATIVE RULINGS:

(1) Plaintiff’s Motion to Quash Third Party Deposition Subpoena (IHG Management, LLC) is GRANTED IN PART. IHG is ordered to designate and produce the officers, directors, managing agents or employees most qualified to testify on its behalf having knowledge of matters 1 and 3 and to produce documents responsive to categories (a), (e), and (g).

MATTERS

  1. The dates that IHG Management, LLC employed Lenora Bejarano You;

3. The wages and/or commissions earned by your current or former employee, Lenor Bejarano You, during her employment with IHG Management, LLC;

DOCUMENTS

Any and all documents relating to the employment of Lenora Bejarano you from January1, 2017 to present, including but not limited to documents relating to the following:

(a) Job title;

(e) The actual compensation paid to her during her employment; and

(g) Actual benefits provided to her during her employment.

(2) Plaintiff’s Motion to Quash Third Party Deposition Subpoena (IHG Management, LLC) is GRANTED IN PART. IHG is ordered to designate and produce the officers, directors, managing agents or employees most qualified to testify on its behalf having knowledge of matters 1 and 3 and to produce documents responsive to categories (a), (e), and (g).

MATTERS

1. The dates that WinPin 85 Investments, LLC employed Lenora Bejarano You;

3. The wages and/or commissions earned by your current or former employee, Lenor Bejarano You, during her employment with WinPin 85 Investments, LLC;

DOCUMENTS

(a) Job title;

(e) The actual compensation paid to her during her employment; and

(g) Actual benefits provided to her during her employment.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RITE AID CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R