This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 02:25:17 (UTC).

LENNOX ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DISTRICT VS ALVAREZ, ADRIAN

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 LENNOX ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against ALVAREZ, ADRIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TITUS, PATRICIA J and GIBBONS, DANIELLE R. A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0136

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TITUS, PATRICIA J

GIBBONS, DANIELLE R. A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LENNOX ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Respondent

ALVAREZ ADRIAN

Other

MARTINEZ HIACYNTH MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

REITKOPP EDWARD BARRY

Respondent Attorney

ADAMS KRISTINE LYNNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketMotion; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 123, Gibbons, Danielle R. A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketNotice - Limited Scope Representation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (-Personal ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LENNOX ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant