This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 19:55:28 (UTC).

LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION INC. VS OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 LENDLEASE US CONSTRUCTION INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER and ANN I. JONES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7800

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

LENDLEASE US CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendants

OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLC

SHORING ENGINEERS

STAR HARDWARE INC

ENCLOS CORP

WOODBRIDGE GLASS INCORPORATED

CONTINENTAL MARBLE & TILE COMPANY

WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION L.P. DBA WEBCOR BUILDERS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP;

L.A. DOWNTOWN INVESTMENT LP

XL FIRE PROTECTION

MASONRY CONCEPTS INC

CLIMATEC LLC

ALAMILLO REBAR INC

AMERICAN STAIR CORPORATION

ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS INC

STANDARD DRYWALL INC

SNAIDERO USA

KAMRAN AND COMPANY INC

J.T. WIMSATT CONTRACTING CO

NEVELL GROUP INC

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

L.A. DOWNTOWN INVESTMENT LP

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANOVER JOHN DAVID

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEN MICHAEL HSI-LIN

OWEN DAVID BRUCE

GROSSBART KENNETH S.

GRANT DAVID C.

ADLER MATTHEW J

RESURRECCION TREVOR O.

LITTMAN DAVID E.

KNUDSEN KATHERINE M

MILLANE JAMES HOWARD

BLANCHARD PHILIP JAMES

ROWEN ERIC VICTOR

Other Attorneys

NIDA ROBERT

BATES JAMES WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/2/2020: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Cross-Complaint

7/15/2021: Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

7/15/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION INC. BY L.A. DOWNTOWN INVESTMENT, LP

7/15/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION INC. BY L.A. DOWNTOWN INVESTMENT, LP

Answer - DEFENDANT CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

7/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS (CROSS-COMPLAINT)

7/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS (CROSS-COMPLAINT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer

7/6/2021: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

7/7/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

6/4/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LIFTING ON STAY OF DISCOVERY; FURTHER...)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LIFTING ON STAY OF DISCOVERY; FURTHER...)

Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DAVID E. LITTMAN

5/5/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DAVID E. LITTMAN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID B. OWEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DAVID E. LITTMAN BY DEFENDANT CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

4/28/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID B. OWEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DAVID E. LITTMAN BY DEFENDANT CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • Hearing05/05/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketSummons ((Cross-Complaint)); Filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by L.A. Downtown Investment LP (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by L.A. Downtown Investment LP (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to First Amended Complaint of Lendlease (US) Construction Inc. by L.A. Downtown Investment, LP); Filed by Lendlease (US) Construction Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 11/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/24/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:52 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 11/10/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Lendlease (US) Construction Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lendlease (US) Construction Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Lendlease (US) Construction Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SNAIDERO U.S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN STAIR CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WOODBRIDGE GLASS INC. is a litigant