This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 01:02:04 (UTC).

LENDING BEE, INC. VS VENTURE INVESTMENT GROUP (VIG), LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 LENDING BEE, INC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against VENTURE INVESTMENT GROUP VIG , LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0788

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

LENDING BEE INC.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

VALSKY VLADIMIR

VENTURE INVESTMENT GROUP VIG LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

DANESHRAD DAVID

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

NUSSBAUM LANE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SUBJECT TO COURTS RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

8/31/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SUBJECT TO COURTS RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

9/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

8/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/20/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/30/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

9/16/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

8/4/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

8/4/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/9/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER); Filed by LENDING BEE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SUBJECT TO COURTS RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6); Filed by LENDING BEE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)); Filed by LENDING BEE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LENDING BEE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LENDING BEE, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by VENTURE INVESTMENT GROUP (VIG), LLC (Defendant); VLADIMIR VALSKY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by VENTURE INVESTMENT GROUP (VIG), LLC (Defendant); VLADIMIR VALSKY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by LENDING BEE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LENDING BEE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LENDING BEE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by LENDING BEE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by LENDING BEE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LENDING BEE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VENTURE INVESTMENT GROUP VIG LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANESHRAD DAVID