This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 14:10:57 (UTC).

LEMOR GREER VS CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 LEMOR GREER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7351

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREER LEMOR

Defendants

CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

DESIGNED RECEIVABLE SOLUTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACKERMAN WHITNEY D

Defendant Attorneys

GONZALES MACKENZIE C.

MOSELY KATHRYN SUE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/10/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

3/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/6/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demand for Jury Trial

2/14/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

2/14/2023: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY BY DEF. CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

2/14/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY BY DEF. CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

Answer

1/18/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/29/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: DESIGNED RECEIVABLE SOLUTIONS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: DESIGNED RECEIVABLE SOLUTIONS, INC. (Defendant); As to: Lemor Greer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Lemor Greer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Lemor Greer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); As to: Lemor Greer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF TRIAL ATTORNEY BY DEF. CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER; Filed by: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: DESIGNED RECEIVABLE SOLUTIONS, INC. (Defendant); As to: Lemor Greer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lemor Greer (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); DESIGNED RECEIVABLE SOLUTIONS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lemor Greer (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); DESIGNED RECEIVABLE SOLUTIONS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lemor Greer (Plaintiff); As to: CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); DESIGNED RECEIVABLE SOLUTIONS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Lemor Greer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randolph M. Hammock in Department 49 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less