This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 15:55:29 (UTC).

LEILANI MARIE GARCIA VS CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 LEILANI MARIE GARCIA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8235

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA LEILANI MARIE

Defendants

CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PALANI GROUP #5 LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN

Defendant Attorney

DEMASON MICHELLE R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/24/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

8/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

1/5/2022: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/10/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2024
  • Hearing07/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Crystal Property Management, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Palani Group #5, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Leilani Marie Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Leilani Marie Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Palani Group #5, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Leilani Marie Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Property Management, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Palani Group #5, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Leilani Marie Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Property Management, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Palani Group #5, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Leilani Marie Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Property Management, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Palani Group #5, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN