This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:11:42 (UTC).

LEIGHTON SAXBY VS CHARLES SMITH

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by LEIGHTON SAXBY against CHARLES SMITH in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3938

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SAXBY LEIGHTON

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

SMITH CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

6/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

SUMMONS

4/26/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/26/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Leighton Saxby (Plaintiff); Charles Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Leighton Saxby (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC703938    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: 2

Saxby v. Smith

Defendant’s Three Motions for Order Compelling Plaintiff’s Verified Responses to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents are GRANTED.

Plaintiff, Leighton Saxby, is ordered to provide verified responses without objection to the foregoing discovery within 10 days. Cal Code Civ Procedure §2030.290(b); 2031.300(b).

The court imposes sanctions of $616.20 against Plaintiff, Leighton Saxby, for the failure to respond to authorized methods of discovery, which is discovery abuse. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 2023.010(d).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC703938    Hearing Date: December 03, 2019    Dept: 2

BC703938 Saxby v. Smith

On the court’s own motion, the hearing on the Motion be Relieved as Counsel set for Tuesday, 12/3/19, is continued to 12/13/19 at 1:30 p.m. in Department SS-2.