Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 21:17:57 (UTC).

LEIGH GORDON, ET AL. VS DARVI ROUSSEVE

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 LEIGH GORDON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DARVI ROUSSEVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1478

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORDON LEIGH

Defendant

ROUSSEVE DARVI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR LEIGHTON

4/8/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR LEIGHTON

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Leighton); Filed by Leigh Gordon (Plaintiff); Leighton Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Leigh Gordon (Plaintiff); Leighton Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Leigh Gordon (Plaintiff); Leighton Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O