Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 11:49:27 (UTC).

LEIANDRA WINTER ET AL VS THE REHAB CENTER OF SANTA MONICA ET

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 LEIANDRA WINTER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against THE REHAB CENTER OF SANTA MONICA ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7771

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

WINTER LEIANDRA

MARINER HEALTHCARE INCORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

THE REHABILITATION CANTER OF SANTA MONICA

DOES 1 TO 100

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/15/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

9/29/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

9/29/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

9/29/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by LEIANDRA WINTER (Plaintiff); MARINER HEALTHCARE INCORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC677771    Hearing Date: August 28, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

LEIANDRA WINTER,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

MARINER HEALTH CARE, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC677771

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

August 28, 2020

Defendant propounded form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs on Plaintiff on 2/28/20. To date, despite an attempt to meet and confer, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendant therefore seek an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding discovery.

Based on current conditions, including, but not limited to, the spread of Covid-19, the court set this matter to be heard on 8/28/20. (Min. Order 5/15/20.) On 7/28/20, Defendant filed a Notice of Hearing Date it served on Plaintiff providing notice of the instant hearing. On 8/21/20, Defendant filed a Notice of Non-Opposition to its motions to compel.

Defendant’s motions are granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and RPDs, without objections, within ten days. CCP §§2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b).

Sanctions are mandatory. §§2030.290(c), 2031.300(c). Defendants do not, however, seek imposition of sanctions, and therefore none are imposed.

As a final note, the court realizes Defendant’s motion to compel responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and request for production is actually three motions combined into one: (a) motion to compel responses to form interrogatories, set one, (b) motion to compel special interrogatories, set one, and (c) motion to compel demand for production of documents, set one. In the future, moving party is ordered to obtain separate hearing reservations and pay separate filing fees. Combining multiple motions under the guise of one motion with one hearing reservation manipulates the Court Reservation System and unfairly jumps ahead of other litigants. Moreover, combining motions to avoid payment of separate filing fees deprives the Court of filing fees it is otherwise entitled to collect.

Be that as it may, in the absence of any objection by Plaintiff and lack of any showing of prejudice, the court will exercise its discretion to hear all three motions, but the above orders will not become effective until moving party pays an additional $120 in filing fees (2 motions filing fees not paid for x $60 filing fee).

Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 28th day of August, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REHABILITATION CENTER OF SANTA MONICA OPERATING COMPANY LP A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant